Mr W Marshall Clark, General Manager from 1945 to 1950.
- ZA 0375-PB-PB0717
- Item
- 1945 - 1950
Part of THL Image Collection
11 results with digital objects Show results with digital objects
Mr W Marshall Clark, General Manager from 1945 to 1950.
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr W Marshall Clark, General Manager from 1945 to 1950.
Part of THL Image Collection
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr W Marshall Clark, General Manager from 1945 to 1950.
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr W Marshall Clark, General Manager from 1945 to 1950.
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr W Marshall Clark, General Manager from 1945 to 1950.
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr Charles Mitchell Hoffe, General Manager from 1941 to 1945.
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr CA Smith, Shipping Manager from 1 November 1924 to 11 August 1938.
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr CA Smith, Shipping Manager from 1 November 1924 to 11 August 1938.
Part of THL Image Collection
Mr TGB Van Veen, Shipping Manager from 1 April 1952 to 20 November 1953.
Part of THL Image Collection
1938
Part of THL Image Collection